+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 04 April 2013
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 26, 2013
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2013, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing: Friday, February 15, 2013, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
- Introduced
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2013: Consent Calendar Passed
March 7, 2013: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor