+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 11, 2014, 1:00 AM Room 159-S
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Ethics and Elections; Referred to Committee on Local Government
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Ethics and Elections
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed on Friday, 01 March 2013
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 4
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Wolfe Moore was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Wolfe Moore
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 281-N
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
FA_2013_HB2185_H_1430
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Wolfe Moore was rejected
CR_2013_HB2185_H_1280
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
March 1, 2013: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Local Government
Type:
Primary Sponsor