+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by Committee on Transportation
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Transportation
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 582-N
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor