+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, 01 June 2012
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 25, 2012
On May 19, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed on Saturday, 19 May 2012
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 113 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Conference committee report now available
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Umbarger, Senator Marshall and Senator Kultala appointed as conferees
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Burgess , Representative Hayzlett and Representative Trimmer as conferees
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 03, 2011, 8:30 AM Room 152-S
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 0
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Government Efficiency
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, February 14, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 546-S
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Government Efficiency
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CCR_2012_HB2175_S_5706
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
CR_2011_HB2175_S_1721
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2011_HB2175_H_1340
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
+ − Votes (4)
May 19, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
May 18, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 9, 2011: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
February 21, 2011: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor