+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 12 May 2011
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed on Thursday, 28 April 2011
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 06, 2011
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 85 Nay: 35
On April 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
- Conference committee report now available
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Umbarger, Senator Marshall and Senator Kultala appointed as conferees
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Hayzlett , Representative Prescott and Representative Wetta as conferees
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 32 Nay: 5
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 15, 2011, 8:30 AM Room 152-S
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 08, 2011, 8:30 AM Room 152-S
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 99 Nay: 21
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, February 14, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 783 DSOB
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CCR_2011_HB2172_S_2511
Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
CR_2011_HB2172_S_1997
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2011_HB2172_H_1326
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
+ − Votes (4)
April 27, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
April 1, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 17, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
February 21, 2011: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor