+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Reengrossed on Monday, April 8, 2019
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 9, 2019
- Approved by Governor on Monday, April 15, 2019
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 114 Nay: 3
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 37 Nay: 0
- Conference committee report now available
- Senator Billinger is appointed to replace Senator Estes on the Conference Committee
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Kerschen, Senator Estes and Senator Francisco appointed as conferees
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Highland , Representative Smith, E. and Representative Carlin as conferees
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Kerschen
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Kerschen was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: (opponents) Thursday, March 14, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 159-S
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: (proponents) Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 159-S
- Hearing: (neutral) Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 159-S
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Commerce; Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 63 Nay: 60
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed on Tuesday, February 26, 2019
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Frownfelter was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Frownfelter
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 112-N
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
Type:
Primary Sponsor