+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Died in Committee
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Health and Human Services
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations and re-referred to Committee of the Whole
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 4, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 112-N
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Health and Human Services
Type:
Primary Sponsor