+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 09, 2014
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 14 May 2014
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Conference committee report now available
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Pilcher-Cook, Senator Bowers and Senator Kelly appointed as conferees
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Crum , Representative Concannon and Representative Ward as conferees
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator V. Schmidt
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pilcher-Cook
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pilcher-Cook was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 118-N
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 0
- Engrossed on Friday, 15 February 2013
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 05, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (5)
CCR_2014_HB2154_S_4563
Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
FA_2014_HB2154_S_3862
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pilcher-Cook was adopted
FA_2014_HB2154_S_3135
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was adopted
CR_2013_HB2154_S_1763
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
CR_2013_HB2154_H_0993
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (4)
May 2, 2014: Conference Committee Report was adopted
May 1, 2014: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 12, 2014: Final Action - Passed
February 18, 2013: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Health and Human Services
Type:
Primary Sponsor