+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate General Orders
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 111 Nay: 12
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Burroughs was rejected Yea: 45 Nay: 66
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Burroughs
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Rural Revitalization
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Rural Revitalization
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Rural Revitalization
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, February 18, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 582-N
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rural Revitalization
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Commerce
Type:
Primary Sponsor