+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Referred to Committee on Interstate Cooperation
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 21, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 118-N
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
- Engrossed on Tuesday, 26 February 2013
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hill was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hill
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 06, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CR_2013_HB2153_S_1927
Committee of the Whole - Referred to Committee on Interstate Cooperation
CR_2013_HB2153_H_1097
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
FA_2013_HB2153_H_1150
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hill was adopted
+ − Vote
February 27, 2013: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Health and Human Services
Type:
Primary Sponsor