+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 12 May 2011
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed on Thursday, 28 April 2011
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 06, 2011
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 120 Nay: 0
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 31 Nay: 8
- Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a conference committee failed.
- Conference committee report now available
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Owens, Senator King and Senator Haley appointed as conferees
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Colloton , Representative Kinzer and Representative McCray-Miller as conferees
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Bruce
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Bruce was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 23 Nay: 14
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Friday, March 04, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 115 Nay: 6
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 09, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CCR_2011_HB2151_S_2477
Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a conference committee failed.
FA_2011_HB2151_S_1815
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Bruce was adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 27, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 30, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 15, 2011: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
February 23, 2011: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor