+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 09, 2017, 08:30 AM Room 546-S
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 5
- Engrossed on Thursday, February 23, 2017
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 582-N
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2017_HB2148_H_1126
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor