+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 10 April 2013
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 05, 2013
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed on Wednesday, 27 March 2013
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 21, 2013, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 117 Nay: 4
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 12, 2013, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Taxation
- Introduced
+ − Votes (2)
March 26, 2013: Final Action - Passed
March 18, 2013: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Taxation
Type:
Primary Sponsor