+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 06 , 2016
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 29, 2016
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Reengrossed on Wednesday, March 23 , 2016
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 112 Nay: 12
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Olson, Senator Petersen and Senator Francisco appointed as conferees
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Seiwert , Representative Alford and Representative Kuether as conferees
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 35 Nay: 4
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Petersen was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Petersen
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Longbine was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Longbine
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Petersen was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Petersen
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Energy and Environment
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Utilities
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed on Thursday, February 26 , 2015
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 105 Nay: 18
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hoffman was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hoffman
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing: Friday, February 20, 2015, 9:00 AM Room 582N
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 10, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 346S
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, February 02, 2015, 9:00 AM Room 582N
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Energy and Environment
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (5)
FA_2016_HB2131_S_3604
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Longbine was adopted
FA_2016_HB2131_S_3998
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Petersen was adopted
FA_2016_HB2131_S_4005
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Petersen was adopted
CR_2016_HB2131_S_3483
Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
FA_2015_HB2131_H_1368
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hoffman was adopted
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Energy and Environment
Type:
Primary Sponsor