+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 15, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 09, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 218-N
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Government Budget
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2017_HB2130_S_2015
Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Ways and Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor