+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 2
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed on Wednesday, 15 February 2012
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, January 23, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2012_HB2121_H_3961
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
February 16, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor