+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 21, 2020 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 35 Nay: 2
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holland
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was adopted Yea: 28 Nay: 9
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Olson
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was rejected Yea: 9 Nay: 30
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 10, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 152-S
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 106 Nay: 18
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to rerefer to committee failed
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge
- Representative Carpenter, B. raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected Yea: 45 Nay: 71
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Probst
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Probst was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Alcala
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Alcala was rejected Yea: 32 Nay: 86
- Engrossed on Tuesday, March 26, 2019
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 218-N
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 5, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 112-N - CANCELED
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Type:
Primary Sponsor