+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 17, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 142-S
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 118 Nay: 4
- Engrossed on Wednesday, February 17, 2021
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Concannon was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Concannon
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Children and Seniors
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 4, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 152-S
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Children and Seniors
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Children and Seniors
Type:
Primary Sponsor