+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 16 April 2013
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 12, 2013
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed on Friday, 05 April 2013
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 116 Nay: 2
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Conference committee report now available
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Abrams, Senator Arpke and Senator Hensley appointed as conferees
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Cassidy , Representative Grosserode and Representative Winn as conferees
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Abrams was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Abrams
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Friday, March 15, 2013, 12:00 PM Room 144-S
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 104 Nay: 19
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Peck was rejected Yea: 31 Nay: 91
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Peck
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 07, 2013, 3:30 PM Room 281-N
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education Budget
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CCR_2013_HB2109_S_2249
Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
FA_2013_HB2109_H_1411
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Peck was rejected Yea: 31 Nay: 91
FA_2013_HB2109_S_1917
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Abrams was adopted
+ − Votes (5)
April 5, 2013: Conference Committee Report was adopted
April 4, 2013: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 21, 2013: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
March 1, 2013: Final Action - Passed
February 28, 2013: Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Peck was rejected
+ − Sponsors (56)
Type:
Primary Sponsor