+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 07, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 06, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed on Tuesday, 28 February 2012
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Schwartz
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Schwartz was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 5
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 08, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, February 07, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
FA_2012_HB2106_H_4420
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Schwartz was adopted
CR_2012_HB2106_H_3964
Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
+ − Vote
February 23, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor