+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 12 May 2011
- Engrossed on Friday, 25 February 2011
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Reengrossed on Thursday, 28 April 2011
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 06, 2011
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
On April 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
- Conference committee report now available
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Owens, Senator King and Senator Haley appointed as conferees
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Kiegerl , Representative S. Gatewood and Representative B. Wolf as conferees
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 08, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 0
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ward was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ward
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Children and Families
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 22, 2011, 9:00 AM Room 142-S
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 17, 2011, 9:00 AM Room 142-S
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Children and Families
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (4)
CCR_2011_HB2105_S_2653
Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
CR_2011_HB2105_S_1798
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2011_HB2105_H_1564
Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ward
FA_2011_HB2105_H_1662
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ward was adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 27, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
April 1, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 15, 2011: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
February 25, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Children and Families
Type:
Primary Sponsor