+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Monday, April 19, 2021
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 9, 2021
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed on Wednesday, April 7, 2021
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 77 Nay: 42
- Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a conference committee failed
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 25 Nay: 14
- Conference committee report now available
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Tyson, Senator Alley and Senator Holland appointed as conferees
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Smith, A. , Representative Mason and Representative Gartner as conferees
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 10, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 114 Nay: 8
- Engrossed on Wednesday, February 17, 2021
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, January 27, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Taxation
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Type:
Primary Sponsor