+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 12 May 2011
- Engrossed on Wednesday, 23 February 2011
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed on Monday, 02 May 2011
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 06, 2011
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 91 Nay: 31
On April 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
- Conference committee report now available
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Owens, Senator King and Senator Haley appointed as 1 conferees
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Colloton , Representative Kinzer and Representative McCray-Miller as conferees
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Friday, March 11, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 112 Nay: 9
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 09, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CCR_2011_HB2104_S_2564
Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
CR_2011_HB2104_H_1287
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2011_HB2104_S_2201
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 27, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
April 1, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 23, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
February 23, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor