+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 08 , 2015
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 03, 2015
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 17, 2015, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 05, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 582N
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor