+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 18, 2019
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 8, 2019
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed on Thursday, April 4, 2019
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred with amendments; Yea: 120 Nay: 2
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Suellentrop was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Suellentrop
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 118-N
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 118-N - CANCELED
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 1
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Children and Seniors
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 5, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 346-S
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Children and Seniors
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Children and Seniors
Type:
Primary Sponsor