+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed on Friday, 25 February 2011
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 66 Nay: 53
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 16, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2011_HB2101_H_1552
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
February 25, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor