+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 14 , 2015
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 11, 2015
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 92 Nay: 23
- Engrossed on Friday, February 13 , 2015
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Rubin was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Rubin
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 03, 2015, 9:00 AM Room 152S
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Veterans, Military and Homeland Security
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
FA_2015_HB2097_H_1082
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Rubin was adopted
+ − Vote
February 13, 2015: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Veterans, Military and Homeland Security
Type:
Primary Sponsor