+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate General Orders
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, March 22, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
- Engrossed on Wednesday, February 24, 2021
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, January 27, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor