+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Died in Committee
On May 19, 2012 in the House:
- Ruled materially changed and referred to Committee on Redistricting
On May 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 21 Nay: 17
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be further amended and be passed as amended by Committee on Reapportionment
On May 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Reapportionment
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Reapportionment
On May 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Reapportionment
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Friday, February 03, 2012, 12:00 PM Room 548-S
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, January 30, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed on Tuesday, 29 March 2011
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 2
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Brookens was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Mast
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 09, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (4)
CR_2012_HB2087_S_5681
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
CR_2012_HB2087_S_5671
Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Reapportionment
CR_2011_HB2087_H_1863
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
FA_2011_HB2087_H_2535
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Brookens was adopted
+ − Votes (2)
May 18, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended
March 30, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor