+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 14, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 24, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 152-S
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2017_HB2084_H_0714
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor