+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Transportation
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 07, 2017, 08:30 AM Room 546-S
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 93 Nay: 32
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 07, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 582-N
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2017_HB2076_S_1346
Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Transportation
CR_2017_HB2076_H_1123
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor