+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, April 9, 2021
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 2, 2021
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Concurred with amendments; Yea: 113 Nay: 9
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to rerefer to committee failed
- Senator Tyson moved to divide the question.
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Part 1 was retained. Yea: 32 Nay: 7
- Senator Tyson withdrew the remaining division of the question.
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 33 Nay: 7
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by Committee on Insurance and Pensions
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, January 20, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 218-N
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Insurance and Pensions
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
Type:
Primary Sponsor