+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 1, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 19 May 2011
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 13, 2011
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed on Wednesday, 11 May 2011
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Conference committee report now available
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Owens, Senator King and Senator Haley appointed as 1 conferees
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Kinzer , Representative Patton and Representative Pauls as conferees
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 100 Nay: 19
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, January 31, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 345
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CCR_2011_HB2071_S_2881
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
+ − Votes (4)
May 10, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
May 9, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 23, 2011: Final Action - Substitute passed
February 17, 2011: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor