+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, April 16, 2021
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 9, 2021
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed on Tuesday, April 6, 2021
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Concurred with amendments; Yea: 119 Nay: 0
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, March 15, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 125 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, January 20, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor