+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On January 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, January 18, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed on Monday, 14 February 2011
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 09, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 82 Nay: 38
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Powell was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Powell
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, January 31, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 345
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
FA_2011_HB2070_H_1152
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Powell was adopted
+ − Vote
February 14, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor