+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate General Orders
On May 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be further amended and be passed as amended by Committee on Reapportionment
- Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Reapportionment
On May 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Reapportionment
On May 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Reapportionment
On January 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On March 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, March 07, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 1
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 09, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CR_2012_HB2069_S_5679
Died on Senate General Orders
CR_2011_HB2069_H_1557
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
CR_2012_HB2069_S_5670
Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Reapportionment
+ − Vote
February 25, 2011: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor