+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed on Tuesday, 01 March 2011
- Reengrossed on Friday, 01 April 2011
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Monday, 18 April 2011
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 08, 2011
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 111 Nay: 11
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Huntington, Senator V. Schmidt and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Schwab , Representative Goico and Representative Mah as conferees
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 36 Nay: 3
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Bruce was rejected Yea: 19 Nay: 20
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Bruce
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ethics and Elections
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Ethics and Elections; Rereferred to Committee on Ethics and Elections
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 10, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 159-S
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 09, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 159-S
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred separately to Committee on Ethics and Elections and Committee on Judiciary
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 83 Nay: 36
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Gregory was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Gregory
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Elections
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 09, 2011, 9:00 AM Room 546-S
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Friday, February 04, 2011, 9:00 AM Room 546-S
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 02, 2011, 9:00 AM Room 546-S
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, January 31, 2011, 9:00 AM Room 546-S
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Elections
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (6)
FA_2011_HB2067_S_2753
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted
FA_2011_HB2067_S_2751
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted
CR_2011_HB2067_S_2157
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
FA_2011_HB2067_S_2359
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Bruce was rejected Yea: 19 Nay: 20
FA_2011_HB2067_H_1640
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Gregory was adopted
CR_2011_HB2067_H_1534
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (4)
March 29, 2011: Concurred with amendments in conference
March 23, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
March 22, 2011: Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Bruce was rejected
February 25, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor