+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Local Government
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 08, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 144-S
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Vote
February 24, 2011: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Local Government
Type:
Primary Sponsor