+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, 25 March 2011
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 18, 2011
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Friday, March 04, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, January 24, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2011_HB2057_H_0671
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
CR_2011_HB2057_S_1752
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2011: Emergency Final Action - Passed
February 7, 2011: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor