+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Monday, 26 March 2012
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 23, 2012
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 07, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, January 26, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 09, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2012: Final Action - Substitute passed
February 13, 2012: Final Action - Substitute passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor