+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (49)
- Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 18, 2017
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 14, 2017
- Reengrossed on Friday, April 7, 2017
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 108 Nay: 15
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 30 Nay: 10
- Conference committee report now available
- Motion to suspend joint rule 3(f), adopted
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator McGinn, Senator Billinger and Senator Kelly appointed as second conferees
- Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Waymaster, Representative Davis and Representative Wolfe Moore appointed as second conferees
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 29 Nay: 11
- Conference committee report now available
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator McGinn, Senator Billinger and Senator Kelly appointed as conferees
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Waymaster , Representative Davis and Representative Wolfe Moore as conferees
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator McGinn
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator McGinn was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Wagle was rejected Yea: 7 Nay: 33
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator McGinn was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Wagle
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator McGinn
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pyle
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pyle was rejected Yea: 10 Nay: 30
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pyle
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pyle was rejected Yea: 6 Nay: 34
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator McGinn
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator McGinn was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 27 Nay: 13
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 08, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Received and Introduced
- Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 87 Nay: 36
- Engrossed on Thursday, February 16, 2017
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative DeGraaf
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Jennings
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Jennings was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative DeGraaf was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative DeGraaf
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative DeGraaf was withdrawn
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative DeGraaf
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative DeGraaf was adopted
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Appropriations
- Hearing: Thursday, January 26, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 112-N
- Hearing: Thursday, January 26, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 112-N
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (14)
CCR_2017_HB2052_S_1785
Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 29 Nay: 11
CCR_2017_HB2052_S_1936
Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 30 Nay: 10
FA_2017_HB2052_S_1524
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator McGinn was adopted
FA_2017_HB2052_S_1515
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pyle was rejected Yea: 6 Nay: 34
CR_2017_HB2052_S_1412
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
FA_2017_HB2052_S_1473
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Wagle was rejected Yea: 7 Nay: 33
FA_2017_HB2052_S_1474
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator McGinn was adopted
FA_2017_HB2052_S_1502
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator McGinn was adopted
FA_2017_HB2052_S_1517
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pyle was rejected Yea: 10 Nay: 30
FA_2017_HB2052_H_1085
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative DeGraaf was adopted
FA_2017_HB2052_H_1089
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative DeGraaf was withdrawn
FA_2017_HB2052_H_1103
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative DeGraaf was adopted
FA_2017_HB2052_H_1066
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Jennings was adopted
CR_2017_HB2052_H_1019
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed