+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 1, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 18 May 2011
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 13, 2011
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed on Monday, 14 February 2011
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Reengrossed on Thursday, 05 May 2011
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 120 Nay: 3
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On April 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 36 Nay: 2
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Conference committee report now available
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator V. Schmidt, Senator Brungardt and Senator Kelly appointed as 2nd conferees
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Colloton, Representative Kinzer and Representative McCray-Miller appointed as 2 conferees
On April 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 35 Nay: 2
- Conference committee report now available
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator V. Schmidt, Senator Brungardt and Senator Kelly appointed as conferees
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Colloton , Representative Kinzer and Representative McCray-Miller as conferees
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 36 Nay: 1
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 03, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 113 Nay: 8
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 25, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (5)
CCR_2011_HB2049_S_2493
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
CCR_2011_HB2049_S_2492
Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 35 Nay: 2
FA_2011_HB2049_S_2012
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected
CR_2011_HB2049_H_0757
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2011_HB2049_S_1692
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
+ − Votes (5)
May 3, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
April 29, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
April 1, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 17, 2011: Final Action - Substitute passed
February 7, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor