+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
- Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained; Yea: 81 Nay: 44
- Upon motion by Rep. Jennings, a motion by Rep. Concannon to pass the bill notwithstanding the Governor's veto was laid on the table.
- Vetoed by Governor; Returned to House on Thursday, March 30, 2017
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Wednesday, March 29, 2017
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 25 Nay: 14
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pilcher-Cook
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pilcher-Cook was withdrawn
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pilcher-Cook
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pilcher-Cook was rejected Yea: 12 Nay: 26
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pilcher-Cook
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pilcher-Cook was rejected Yea: 13 Nay: 25
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pilcher-Cook was rejected Yea: 18 Nay: 20
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pilcher-Cook
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Baumgardner
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Baumgardner was rejected Yea: 13 Nay: 25
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pyle
- Senator V. Schmidt raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pyle was rejected Yea: 13 Nay: 25
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed Yea: 25 Nay: 13
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
- Hearing: (opponents) Tuesday, March 21, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 548-S
- Hearing: (proponents) Monday, March 20, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 346-S
- Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
- Engrossed on Wednesday, February 22, 2017
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 81 Nay: 44
- Received and Introduced
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Whitmer
- Motion by Rep. Hineman to change the sequence of General Orders adopted.
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Concannon
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Concannon was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carpenter was rejected Yea: 50 Nay: 74
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carpenter
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Whitmer was rejected Yea: 50 Nay: 74
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Lakin
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Lakin was rejected Yea: 56 Nay: 68
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Landwehr
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Landwehr was rejected Yea: 48 Nay: 74
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Weber
- Representative Whipple raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Weber was rejected Yea: 49 Nay: 72
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended Yea: 83 Nay: 40
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services
- Hearing: Thursday, January 26, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 546-S
- Hearing: Thursday, January 26, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 546-S
- Hearing: Thursday, January 26, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 546-S
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 24, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 546-S
- Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (13)
FA_2017_HB2044_S_1734
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Baumgardner was rejected Yea: 13 Nay: 25
FA_2017_HB2044_S_1738
Senator V. Schmidt raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
FA_2017_HB2044_S_1691
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pilcher-Cook was rejected Yea: 12 Nay: 26
FA_2017_HB2044_S_1711
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pilcher-Cook was rejected Yea: 13 Nay: 25
FA_2017_HB2044_S_1718
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pilcher-Cook was rejected Yea: 18 Nay: 20
CR_2017_HB2044_S_1639
Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pilcher-Cook
FA_2017_HB2044_H_1260
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carpenter was rejected Yea: 50 Nay: 74
FA_2017_HB2044_H_1255
Representative Whipple raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
FA_2017_HB2044_H_1256
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Lakin was rejected Yea: 56 Nay: 68
FA_2017_HB2044_H_1258
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Landwehr was rejected Yea: 48 Nay: 74
FA_2017_HB2044_H_1267
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Whitmer was rejected Yea: 50 Nay: 74
FA_2017_HB2044_H_1250
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Concannon was adopted
CR_2017_HB2044_H_0739
Motion by Rep. Hineman to change the sequence of General Orders adopted.