+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Monday, 28 March 2011
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 22, 2011
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Friday, March 04, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 0
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, February 07, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2011: Emergency Final Action - Passed
February 16, 2011: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor