+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Reengrossed on Friday, 01 April 2011
- Engrossed on Thursday, 24 February 2011
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 12 April 2011
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 08, 2011
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Concurred with amendments; Yea: 100 Nay: 22
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 24 Nay: 15
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pilcher-Cook was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pilcher-Cook
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Kelly was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Kelly
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Vratil was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Vratil
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 22, 2011, 12:00 PM Room 346-S
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 17, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 96 Nay: 25
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Flaharty was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Flaharty
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Loganbill was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Loganbill
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, January 26, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 346-S
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (7)
FA_2011_HB2035_S_2418
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pilcher-Cook was adopted
FA_2011_HB2035_S_2436
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Kelly was adopted
CR_2011_HB2035_S_2226
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
FA_2011_HB2035_S_2417
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Vratil was adopted
FA_2011_HB2035_H_1315
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Flaharty was rejected
FA_2011_HB2035_H_1608
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Loganbill was rejected
CR_2011_HB2035_H_1160
Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
+ − Votes (3)
March 29, 2011: Concurred with amendments
March 23, 2011: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
February 24, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsors (58)
Type:
Primary Sponsor