+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed on Friday, 25 February 2011
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Transportation
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Transportation; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 95 Nay: 23
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Knox was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Knox
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Knox was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Knox
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, January 26, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 783 DSOB
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
FA_2011_HB2034_H_1627
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Knox was adopted
FA_2011_HB2034_H_1628
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Knox was rejected
+ − Vote
February 25, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor