+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed on Thursday, 24 February 2011
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 116 Nay: 5
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 08, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice; Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2011_HB2031_H_1471
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
February 24, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor