+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Reengrossed on Monday, 21 March 2011
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed on Thursday, 10 February 2011
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Monday, 28 March 2011
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 25, 2011
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 03, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 0
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 25, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2011_HB2030_S_1732
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
CR_2011_HB2030_H_0905
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2011: Emergency Final Action - Passed
February 10, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Special Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor