+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Reengrossed on Tuesday, 22 March 2011
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed on Thursday, 10 February 2011
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, 08 April 2011
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 01, 2011
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Concurred with amendments; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Owens was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Owens
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 03, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 1
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 25, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CR_2011_HB2028_S_1792
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
FA_2011_HB2028_S_1946
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Owens was adopted
CR_2011_HB2028_H_0886
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (3)
March 21, 2011: Concurred with amendments
March 15, 2011: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
February 10, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor