+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 4, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Saturday, May 12, 2018
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 04, 2018
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed on Tuesday, May 1, 2018
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 107 Nay: 13
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 32 Nay: 6
- Conference committee report now available
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Hawkins, Representative Concannon and Representative Murnan appointed as third conferees
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Horn is appointed to replace Representative Murnan on the Conference Committee
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator V. Schmidt, Senator Estes and Senator Kelly appointed as second conferees
- Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator V. Schmidt, Senator Estes and Senator Kelly appointed as third conferees
On April 7, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Hawkins, Representative Hawkins, Representative Concannon and Representative Murnan appointed as second conferees Yea: 75 Nay: 45
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On April 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 24 Nay: 14
- Motion to return bill to conference failed. Yea: 20 Nay: 20
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Conference committee report now available
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator V. Schmidt, Senator Bollier and Senator Kelly appointed as conferees
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Hawkins , Representative Concannon and Representative Murnan as conferees
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator V. Schmidt
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 08, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 118-N
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 2
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Health and Human Services
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 17, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 546-S
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (5)
CCR_2018_HB2028_S_4238
Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 32 Nay: 6
CCR_2018_HB2028_S_4182
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
FA_2018_HB2028_S_3983
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was adopted
CR_2018_HB2028_S_3892
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
CR_2017_HB2028_H_0412
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Public Health and Welfare
Type:
Primary Sponsor